Larry v. Maint. Training Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Larry
Defendant: Maint. Training Corp., Personnel Employed at said fac., East Miss Correc. Fac., Wilkinson County Correc. Fac., Capt. D. Smith, J. Collins, Ruffin and Chapman
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00655
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, on or before December 17, 2021, Plaintiff must file a written consistent with this Order. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 12/3/2021. (LDR)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adrian Larry. (Signed and filed document with notation on the bottom: NO Proceed Further for this is not false nor vendictive motives) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian Larry (MGB) #1 Envelope)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Adrian Larry. #1 Envelope) (MGB).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 11/18/2021, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/19/2021. (LDR)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/19/2021. (LDR)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adrian Larry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chapman, J. Collins, East Miss Correc. Fac., Maint. Training Corp., Personnel Employed at said fac., Ruffin, D. Smith, and Wilkinson County Correc. Fac. filed by Adrian Larry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RVR 1, #2 Exhibit B - RVR 2, #3 Exhibit C - Second Step Response, #4 Exhibit D - Admin Remedy Program Rejection, #5 Exhibit E - Letter and Motion to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit F - MDOC Disciplinary Procedures, #7 Exhibit G - Special Management Housing, #8 Unmarked Attachments - MDOC First Step Response Form, #9 Envelope, #10 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry v. Maint. Training Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Larry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maint. Training Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personnel Employed at said fac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Miss Correc. Fac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkinson County Correc. Fac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?