Armstrong v. Madison County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Sedric Deon Armstrong
Defendant: Madison County Detention Center
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00658
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Response to Order re #11 ORDER, granting #7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than November 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/12/2021. (CS) filed by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, granting #7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than November 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/12/2021. (CS)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/10/2021. (LDR)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #4 Order by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #5 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) Modified on 10/29/2021 (VM).
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE in re #4 by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/19/2021. (LDR)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 11/18/2021, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/19/2021. (LDR)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/19/2021. (LDR) Modified on 10/19/2021 (LDR).
October 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrect PDF document attached. Court staff has correctly refiled the document as Document #5 .(LDR)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sedric Deon Armstrong (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison County Detention Center, filed by Sedric Deon Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2021: #2 Notice of Assignment) (cwl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Madison County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedric Deon Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?