Groves v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Antonio Groves
Defendant: Warden James Miller, C.I.D. Lt. Tanya Burks, Burl Cain and Officer Bailey
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00695
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Warden James Miller, Tanya Burks, Burl Cain and Officer Bailey on 12/29/2021. Waiver of Service due by 1/28/2022. (CS)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint and Add Exhibits. Clerk shall add Officer Bailey as a Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/29/2021. (CS)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Response to Order re #6 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Christopher Antonio Groves shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than December 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/29/2021. (LDR) filed by Christopher Antonio Groves (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(cwl)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Christopher Antonio Groves (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Administrative Remedy, #2 Exhibit B Administrative Remedy, #3 Exhibit C Administrative Remedy, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(cwl)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Christopher Antonio Groves shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than December 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/29/2021. (LDR)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/29/2021. (LDR)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Christopher Antonio Groves. (MGB)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/2/2021. (LDR)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Christopher Antonio Groves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tanya Burks, Burl Cain, James Miller, filed by Christopher Groves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groves v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Antonio Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.I.D. Lt. Tanya Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?