Hopson v. Avery et al
Plaintiff: Edward James Hopson
Defendant: Betty Sue Hopson Avery and Ashley Walker
Case Number: 3:2021cv00708
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 7, 2021. (AS)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan Max Title Loans Sheet, #2 Envelope)(PG)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 23, 2021. (AS)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 4, 2021. (AS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betty Sue Hopson Avery, Ashley Walker, filed by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Exhibit A - Newspaper clipping, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Avery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward James Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Sue Hopson Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?