Island Farms, LLC et al v. UMB Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Island Farms, LLC, Porter Planting Company Partnership and Wyatt Farm Partnership
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00721
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Amended Complaint UMB Bank, N.A. answer due 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/18/22 (NL)
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Amended Complaint by UMB Bank, N.A. (Reed, William)
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UMB Bank, N.A., filed by Island Farms, LLC, Porter Planting Company Partnership, Wyatt Farm Partnership.(Barrett, John)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiff's Deadline to respond is 2/3/2022 and Defendant's reply is extended thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 1/7/2022. (TDB)
December 30, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Island Farms, LLC, Porter Planting Company Partnership, Wyatt Farm Partnership (Barrett, John)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UMB Bank, N.A. (Reed, William)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by UMB Bank, N.A. (Reed, William)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney, Peter Louis Riggs, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, UMB Bank, N.A., in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Courts website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/17/21 (NL)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Peter Louis Riggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4728714) by UMB Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Reed, William)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. UMB Bank, N.A. answer due 12/21/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/22/21 (NL)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by UMB Bank, N.A. (Reed, William)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UMB Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent UMB Financial Corporation for UMB Bank, N.A.. (Reed, William)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Conner Graham Whitten, I on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Whitten, Conner)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Reed on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Reed, William)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abdalla, Gerald)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Carlos Tanner, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tanner, E.)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Island Farms, LLC, Porter Planting Company Partnership, Wyatt Farm Partnership. UMB Bank, N.A. served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. (Barrett, John)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UMB Bank, N.A. (LAT)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against UMB Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4700150), filed by Island Farms, LLC, Porter Planting Company Partnership, Wyatt Farm Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)
November 8, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Docket Annotation: Filed in wrong case. It should be disregarded. (LAT)
November 8, 2021 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 35 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment (HTW-LGI) on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/5/2021. (LAT) Modified on 11/8/2021 (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Farms, LLC et al v. UMB Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Farms, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: E. Carlos Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter Planting Company Partnership
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: E. Carlos Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt Farm Partnership
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: E. Carlos Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter L. Riggs - PHV
Represented By: William N. Reed
Represented By: Conner Graham Whitten, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?