Moody v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Kenneth Moody
Defendant: John Doe
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00727
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 12/29/2021. (CS)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 Response (Complaint) to Order re #3 ORDER, on or before December 15, 2021, Plaintiff shall complete, sign and file the attached form entitled "Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Filing A Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. 1983" filed by Kenneth Moody. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment Letter, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(KNS)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Kenneth Moody. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(CO)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before December 15, 2021, Plaintiff shall complete, sign and file the attached form entitled "Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Filing A Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. 1983." Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 42 U.S.C. 1983 Form) (CS)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth Moody. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, filed by Kenneth Moody. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?