Fisher v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maxine Fisher
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and John Does I-V
Case Number: 3:2021cv00754
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Walmart, Inc. (Moss, Rajita)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Jury Trial set for 1/3/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 7/20/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 4/20/2022 ; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 5/20/2022 ; Motions due by 8/3/2022 ; Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/11/22 (NL)
January 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/7/2022. Participants: Rejita Iyer Moss. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. The Court spoke with the party. Order to be entered. (NL)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Walmart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Walmart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(NL)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (Moss, Rajita)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 45CI1:21-cv-00219-JA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4710741) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Fisher
Represented By: Lawrence S. Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?