Lindsey et al v. Meridian Bevco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tyeasha Bell Lindsey, Hype Adventures, LLC, Dena M. MALUGEN, Jackson Hayes Malugen and Charles Thomas Malugen
Defendant: Meridian Bevco, LLC, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC, Rockstep Capital, LLC, Rockstep Capital Corporation, Andy Isaac Weiner, Matthew Jeffery, Elisha D. Jeffery and Gregg Borman, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00275
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. Plaintiffs are granted a sixty (60) day extension of time to serve process on Defendant Gregg Borman, Sr. Deadline to serve process is September 6, 2022. No further order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 7/18/2022 (MJ)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/17/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 2/3/2023; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 8/8/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/3/2022; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/5/2022; Motions due by 2/17/2023; Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac ; ADR Report due by 6/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 07/08/2022 (NL)
July 7, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Bradley J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4877500) by Rockstep Capital Corporation, Rockstep Capital, LLC, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Bonner, Eric)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney, Bradley J. Smith, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants, Rockstep Capital Corporation, Rockstep Capital, LLC, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC., in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 07/07/2022 (NL)
July 6, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hype Adventures, LLC (Markham, Kenneth)
July 6, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #28 , #29 : Docket entries fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit the docket entries to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (cwl)
July 6, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/6/2022. Participants: Kenneth Dustin Markham, Laura Ford Rose, Andy Weiner, Matthew Jeffery, Elisha Jeffery, and Eric David Bonne. The court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (NL)
July 5, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Tyeasha Bell Lindsey, Dena M. Malugen, Jackson Hayes Malugen, Charles Thomas Malugen and Hype Adventures, LLC (Markham, Kenneth) Modified on 7/6/2022 (cwl).
July 5, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Processon Defendant Gregg Borman, Sr. by Tyeasha Bell Lindsey, Dena M. Malugen, Jackson Hayes Malugen, Charles Thomas Malugen and Hype Adventures, LLC (Markham, Kenneth) Modified on 7/6/2022 (cwl).
July 1, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Rockstep Capital Corporation, Rockstep Capital, LLC, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC (Bonner, Eric)
July 1, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Andy Isaac Weiner (Rose, Laura)
July 1, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Elisha D. Jeffery, Matthew Jeffery, Meridian Bevco, LLC (Rose, Laura)
June 29, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meridian Bevco, LLC (Rose, Laura)
June 28, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC (Bonner, Eric)
June 28, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockstep Capital Corporation (Bonner, Eric)
June 28, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockstep Capital, LLC (Bonner, Eric)
June 24, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ray A. Young, Jr on behalf of Elisha D. Jeffery, Matthew Jeffery, Meridian Bevco, LLC, Andy Isaac Weiner (Young, Ray)
June 23, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew M. Williams and Emma B. Ligon by Meridian Bevco, LLC, Andy Isaac Weiner (Williams, Matthew)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew M. Williams terminated. Laura Rose entered appearances and filed responsive pleadings on behalf of both Meridian Bevco, LLC and Andy Isaac Weiner, and will continue to represent them in this matter. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 6/23/22 (NL)
June 22, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew Jeffery.(Rose, Laura)
June 22, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Meridian Bevco, LLC.(Rose, Laura)
June 22, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Elisha D. Jeffery.(Rose, Laura)
June 22, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Andy Isaac Weiner.(Rose, Laura)
June 22, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC.(Bonner, Eric)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Rockstep Capital Corporation.(Bonner, Eric)
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Rockstep Capital, LLC.(Bonner, Eric)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Rockstep Capital Corporation, Rockstep Capital, LLC, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC (Bonner, Eric)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. The answer of Defendants Meridian Bevco, LLC, Matthew Jeffery, Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC, Rockstep Capital Corporation, Elisha D. Jeffery, Rockstep Capital, LLC, and Andy Isaac Weiner is due on or before June 22, 2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/27/22 (NL)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Elisha D. Jeffery, Matthew Jeffery, Meridian Bevco, LLC, Andy Isaac Weiner (Rose, Laura)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012(NL)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 State Court Record by Defendant Andy Isaac Weiner Volumes 1 (Williams, Matthew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 Joinder in Document by Rockstep Capital, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Bonner, Eric)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 Joinder in Document by Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Bonner, Eric)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 Joinder in Document by Rockstep Capital Corporation to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Bonner, Eric)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 Joinder in Document by Elisha D. Jeffery to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Rose, Laura)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Joinder in Document by Matthew Jeffery to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Rose, Laura)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Joinder in Document by Meridian Bevco, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Andy Isaac Weiner (Rose, Laura)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andy Isaac Weiner from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, case number 22-cv-003 (CW). ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4844942) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Meridian Bevco SOS Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rockstep SOS Filing, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rockstep Capital ownership, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel List, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(CO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey et al v. Meridian Bevco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeasha Bell Lindsey
Represented By: Kenneth Dustin Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hype Adventures, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Dustin Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena M. MALUGEN
Represented By: Kenneth Dustin Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Hayes Malugen
Represented By: Kenneth Dustin Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Thomas Malugen
Represented By: Kenneth Dustin Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Bevco, LLC
Represented By: Laura Ford Rose
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Represented By: Ray A. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstep Meridian Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Represented By: Bradley J. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstep Capital, LLC
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Represented By: Bradley J. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstep Capital Corporation
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Represented By: Bradley J. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Isaac Weiner
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Represented By: Laura Ford Rose
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Represented By: Ray A. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jeffery
Represented By: Laura Ford Rose
Represented By: Ray A. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisha D. Jeffery
Represented By: Laura Ford Rose
Represented By: Ray A. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Borman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?