Banks v. Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Queen Banks
Defendant: Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, LPN Morgan McGuire and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00433
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Abby Little by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Morgan McGuire by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Morgan McGuire (Frye, William)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Morgan McGuire (Frye, William)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Morgan McGuire (Frye, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting #16 Motion To Set Deadlines as set out in the Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on August 24, 2022. (SP)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Morgan McGuire (Gunn, George). Added MOTION TO SET DEADLINES on 8/22/2022 (PG). Modified on 8/22/2022 (PG).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Request for Admissions by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Request for Production by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Interrogatories by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Earl Thompson, II on behalf of Queen Banks (Thompson, Robert)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #8 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/18/2022. (JEJ)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Queen Banks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Warren)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Queen Banks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Banks' Affidavit as to McGuire, #3 Errata C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Warren)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by Queen Banks (Martin, Warren)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George Clanton Gunn, IV on behalf of Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Morgan McGuire (Gunn, George)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morgan McGuire (Frye, William)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Morgan McGuire (Frye, William)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Frye, William)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC.(Frye, William)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC from Circuit-Hinds, case number 25CI1:22-cv-00414-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4894761) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment 1 Certified State Court Record, #4 Attachment 2 State Court Complaint, #5 Cover Letter)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Banks
Represented By: Warren L. Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Earl Thompson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Morgan McGuire
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?