Parker v. Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Parker
Defendant: Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00583
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 12/5/22. (KPM)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc..(Cupp, Steven)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Parker. Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc. served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Watson, Louis)
October 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Patricia Parker (Norris, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc.. (cwl)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4951506), filed by Patricia Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Parker
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Care Developmental Centers of Mississippi I, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?