Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC v. Kenneth Love
Plaintiff: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Kenneth Love doing business as Magnolia Roofing
Case Number: 3:2022cv00609
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kenneth Love answer due 12/27/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/9/2022. (dcw)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenneth Love (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- E-mail from Plaintiff Counsel)(Waller, Robert)
December 8, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : Incorrect division name. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings with correct division, Northern. (KNS)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. By agreement of the parties, Defendant's answer is due by 12/12/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/15/2022. (dcw)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenneth Love (Waller, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Waller on behalf of Kenneth Love (Waller, Robert)
November 10, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Multiple documents filed as one pleading. Attorney is directed to file each document separately (the same PDF document should be used) selecting correct event. Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer should be filed. (KNS)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC. Kenneth Love served on 10/20/2022, answer due 11/10/2022. (Smith, Alan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC (Smith, Alan)
October 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Love. (VM)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Love (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4959161), filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invoice No. 6122 from Magnolia Roofing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Contractor's Lien Waiver by Magnolia Roofing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wire Transfer Instructions re Magnolia Roofing, #4 Exhibit 4 - Confirmations of Wire Transfers to Magnolia Roofing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Efaye Bailey, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Brian Shoch, #7 Exhibit 7 - Demand Letter (8.29.22) to Magnolia Roofing, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC v. Kenneth Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Alan Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Love doing business as Magnolia Roofing
Represented By: Robert O. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?