Moore v. Moore
Plaintiff: Surf Moore
Defendant: Stanley Moore
Case Number: 3:2022cv00628
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at #http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. Pro Se Parties should request the record from the Clerks Office. (PG)
December 19, 2022 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. Once the record has been accepted, a separate docket entry will be made notifying parties that they may then access the record via the Fifth Circuit website. Pro se parties may request the record from the clerk's office. (PG)
December 16, 2022 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 22-60653 and Initial Case Check for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Surf Moore. (cwl)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, by Surf Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court enters this Final Judgment for Stanley Moore. Surf Moores claims are dismissed without prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 11/29/2022 (PG)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. For the reasons stated, the Court DISMISSES Moores #5 Amended Complaint without prejudice. The Court will issue a separate final judgment consistent with this Order and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 11/29/2022 (PG)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stanley Moore, filed by Surf Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #3 Order by Surf Moore (PG)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Complaint #1 and Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 31, 2022. (AS)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Surf Moore. (PG)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & Injunction against Stanley Moore, filed by Surf Moore. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surf Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?