Santiago v. Martin
Plaintiff: Joel Alvarado Santiago
Defendant: Marcus Martin
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2022cv00652
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Santiago has 20 days from the entry of this Order to pay the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 12/21/2022 (ND)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Alvarado Santiago. (PG)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 Letter re Filing Fee from Joe Alvarado Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: on or before 12/9/2022, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/9/2022 (ND)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joel Alvarado Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment, 17-165, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, 19-78, #3 Exhibit C - Inmate Request, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Alvarado Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?