Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Smartnews International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Defendant: Smartnews International, Inc. doing business as Smartnews, Inc. doing business as Smartnews
Counter Claimant: Smartnews International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00118
Filed: February 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER finding as moot #81 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/14/2023 (MJ)
November 6, 2023 Filing 85 NOTICE of Service of Second Set of Request for Admissions by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
November 6, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Second Set of Request for Production by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
November 6, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE of Service of Second Set of Interrogatories by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
October 13, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Designation of Experts by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
October 11, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION to Extend Case Management Order Deadline by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
October 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2023 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, #65 Second MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, #64 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, #26 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. The court heard arguments of counsel. Order forthcoming. Participants: Wilson Carroll, Dorsey Carson, Jr., Harli Malone Sesser, Kathryn Goff and Tyler Newby (via zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber Fred Jeske, Telephone Number : 601-255-6432, E-mail : fred_jeske@mssd.uscourts.gov. (NL)
October 5, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Harli Malone Sesser on behalf of Smartnews International, Inc. (Sesser, Harli)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 9/21/2023 (MJ)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelli M. Slater terminated. Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff will continue to be represented by attorneys of record of CLG; and Tyler G. Newby, Joseph S. Belichick, Diana Buck, Deena J.G. Feit, and Irene Del Rocio Aguirre, of Fenwick & West LLP. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 9/19/23 (NL)
September 18, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kelli M. Slater by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
September 13, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Irene Aguirre be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Smartnews International, Inc., in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 9/12/23 (NL)
September 11, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION for Irene Aguirre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5210276) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey)
August 29, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on all pending Motions #45 MOTION For Alternative Service Under FRCP Rule 4 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, #52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal, #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, #26 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, #64 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct, #65 Second MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, #60 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply, #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac (NL)
August 25, 2023 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 Second MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
August 25, 2023 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
August 21, 2023 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
August 18, 2023 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #71 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 Second MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SmartNews International, Statement of Information - CA SOS, #2 Exhibit B - SmartNews webpages)(Carson, Dorsey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #69 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SmartNews International, Statement of Information - CA SOS, #2 Exhibit B - SmartNews webpages)(Carson, Dorsey)
August 14, 2023 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
August 8, 2023 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
August 8, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #66: Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password forany ECF filing. Document #66 will be disregarded. (cwl)
August 7, 2023 Filing 66 ***ERROR****DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Hatten, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2023 (cwl).
August 7, 2023 Filing 65 Second MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
August 4, 2023 Filing 64 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
August 1, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #63: Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Memorandum in Support. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. (cwl)
July 31, 2023 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support, re 62 RESPONSE in Oppositionre #52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson) Modified on 8/1/2023 (cwl).
July 31, 2023 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 31, 2023 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Support re #60 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 31, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 28, 2023 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION For Altnernative Service Under FRCP Rule 4 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 26, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 26, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 26, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 21, 2023 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Alternative Service filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 21, 2023 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION For Altnernative Service Under FRCP Rule 4 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kotaro Suzuki Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Tyler Newby Declaration)(Carson, Dorsey)
July 17, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Service of Verified Objections and Response to Interrogatories by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 17, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #51 Rebuttal by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 14, 2023 Filing 51 Rebuttal re #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 12, 2023 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 10, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Response to Request for Production by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 10, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Response to Interrogatories by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 7, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Service of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiffs Response to Request for Admissions by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 7, 2023 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #45 MOTION For Altnernative Service Under FRCP Rule 4 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 7, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION For Altnernative Service Under FRCP Rule 4 re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - "About Smartnews", #2 Exhibit B - HIB Visa and Green Card Report, #3 Exhibit C - Smartnews Int'l Address and CEO, #4 Exhibit D - 5/11 Email, #5 Exhibit E - 5/12 Email, #6 Exhibit F - 5/30 Email, #7 Exhibit G - 6/2 Email, #8 Exhibit H - 6/12 Email, #9 Exhibit I - 6/12(2) Email, #10 Exhibit J - Hague Service Quote)(Carroll, Wilson)
July 5, 2023 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #43 Response in Opposition, re #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 5, 2023 Filing 43 Response in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Doc 26-1 Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff First Discovery Requests, # 3 Exhibit C - Good Faith Certificate)(Carson, Dorsey) filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
July 5, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number AND a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (cwl)
July 3, 2023 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carroll, Wilson)
June 30, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Admissions by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 30, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 30, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 26, 2023 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 21, 2023 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 21, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Doc 26-1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff First Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Good Faith Certificate)(Carson, Dorsey)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated ORDER Establishing ESI Protocol Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 6/16/2023 (MJ)
June 15, 2023 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Discovery) filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 13, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 12, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint, by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
June 8, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #30 Response in Opposition filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
June 8, 2023 Filing 30 Response in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Discovery) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey) filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
June 7, 2023 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Discovery) filed by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 7, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Discovery) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
May 31, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
May 31, 2023 Filing 26 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Carroll, Wilson)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/20/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 12/6/2023; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2023; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2023; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 9/6/2023; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 10/6/2023; Motions due by 12/20/2023; Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/30/23 (NL)
May 30, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2023. Participants: Wilson Carroll, Kelli Slater and Tyler Newby. Court conferred with counsel. Order to be entered. (NL) . (Defendant to file motion for stayed or bifurcated discovery within 21 days of filing of amended complaint.)
May 5, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #21 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated.(Carroll, Wilson)
April 18, 2023 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT re #21 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Exhibits by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Printout of Obituary Page for Kimberly Dawn Moody, #2 Exhibit C - Printout of Associated Online Guest Book, #3 Exhibit D - Partial Printout of Webpage of Kim Moody's Obituary, #4 Exhibit E - Print-Optimized Format of Plaintiff's Version of Obituary, #5 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Alleged Copyrights)(Carson, Dorsey)
April 18, 2023 Filing 22 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
April 14, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM and DEFENSES against Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
April 6, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Carroll, Wilson)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys, Joseph S. Belichick, Diana Buck, Deena J.G. Feit and Tyler G. Newby, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Smartness International, Inc., in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 3/31/23 (NL)
March 29, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn P. Goff on behalf of Smartnews International, Inc. (Goff, Kathryn)
March 29, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Tyler G. Newby to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Tyler Newby)(Carson, Dorsey)
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Deena J.G. Feit to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Deena Feit (WA), #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Deena Feit (MA))(Carson, Dorsey)
March 29, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Diana Buck to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Diana Buck)(Carson, Dorsey)
March 29, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Joseph S. Belichick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Smartnews International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Joseph Belichick)(Carson, Dorsey)
March 29, 2023 Filing 14 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MOTION for Tyler G. Newby to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5080559) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey) Modified on 3/29/2023 (PG).
March 29, 2023 Filing 13 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MOTION for Deena J.G. Feit to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5080555) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey) Modified on 3/29/2023 (PG).
March 29, 2023 Filing 12 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MOTION for Diana Buck to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5080552) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey) Modified on 3/29/2023 (PG).
March 29, 2023 Filing 11 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MOTION for Joseph S. Belichick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5080549) by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey) Modified on 3/29/2023 (PG).
March 29, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc # [11,12,13 and 14] Attorney advises that there is an error in these entries, and it should be disregarded. (PG)
March 24, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smartnews International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smartnews, Inc. for Smartnews International, Inc.. (Carson, Dorsey)
March 24, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Smartnews International, Inc..(Carson, Dorsey)
March 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelli M. Slater on behalf of Smartnews International, Inc. (Slater, Kelli)
March 20, 2023 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Defendant SmartNews International, Inc., d/b/a SmartNews, Inc., shall file its responsive pleadings on or before Friday, March 24, 2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 3/20/23 (NL)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 as to #1 Complaint. Defendant SmartNews International, Inc., d/b/a SmartNews, Inc., shall file its responsive pleadings on or before Monday, March 20, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 3/7/23 (NL)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Smartnews International, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. Smartnews International, Inc. served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (Carroll, Wilson)
February 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF REORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OF APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT mailed to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000, AO-121 Form, re #1 Complaint, with schedule attached. (PG)
February 14, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Smartnews International, Inc. (PG)
February 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smartnews International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 3408), filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cop of Smart news ad, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Web View, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Web View, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Screenshots, #5 Exhibit E - Copy of Web View and Smart View formats, #6 Exhibit F - Copy of Newspaper articles, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Smartnews International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Represented By: Wilson H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartnews International, Inc. doing business as Smartnews, Inc. doing business as Smartnews
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Deena J.G. Feit - PHV
Represented By: Diana Buck - PHV
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick - PHV
Represented By: Kelli M. Slater
Represented By: Tyler G. Newby - PHV
Represented By: Kathryn P. Goff
Represented By: Irene Del Rocio Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Harli Malone Sesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Smartnews International, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler G. Newby - PHV
Represented By: Deena J.G. Feit - PHV
Represented By: Joseph S. Belichick - PHV
Represented By: Diana Buck - PHV
Represented By: Kathryn P. Goff
Represented By: Kelli M. Slater
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Irene Del Rocio Aguirre - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?