Morgan v. Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pearl Morgan
Defendant: Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as American Medical Response
Case Number: 3:2023cv00278
Filed: April 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2023 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel or the parties shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 7/3/23. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via U.S. Mail.) (KPM)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 Notice of Removal. Mail sent to Pearl Morgan. (PG)
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc..(Julian, Thomas)
April 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. from County Court of Hinds County, case number 25CO1:23-cv-973-LCS. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5102605) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as American Medical Response
Represented By: Thomas R. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?