Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Particle Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Defendant: Particle Media, Inc. doing business as NewsBreak
Case Number: 3:2023cv00391
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc. #7 : Pursuant to consolidation order #6 , all filing should now be made in the Lead Case No. 3:23-cv-26-TSL-MTP. Attorney is directed to refile this document in the lead case. (CO)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Particle Media, Inc..(Carmody, Stephen)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - All future pleadings and filings shall be filed in Civil Action No. 3:23-cv-26-TSL-MTP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/13/2023 (CO)
July 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker added. Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (CO)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. Particle Media, Inc. served on 6/27/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Carroll, Wilson)
June 21, 2023 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registered Articles, #2 Exhibit B1 - Registration Certificates, #3 Exhibit B2 - Registration Certificates, #4 Exhibit B3 - Registration Certificates, #5 Exhibit B4 - Registration Certificates, #6 Exhibit C - Registered Photos, #7 Exhibit D - Registration Certificate, #8 Exhibit E - Articles Stolen Behind Paywalls, #9 Exhibit F - Altered CMI)(Carroll, Wilson)
June 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Particle Media, Inc. (LAT)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright re #1 Complaint. (LAT)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Particle Media, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4756), filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated v. Particle Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Represented By: Wilson H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Particle Media, Inc. doing business as NewsBreak
Represented By: Stephen J. Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?