Dorsey v. Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Dorsey
Defendant: Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC and John and Jane Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2023cv03152
Filed: December 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Frye, William)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Shirley Dorsey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Response to Def. Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Memo in Support of Resp. to Def. Motion to Dismiss)(Neely, Walter)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set out in the Order. Plaintiff's medical-negligence and survival-type claims are time-barred. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 18, 2024. (SP)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (First Amended Complaint) by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Gunn, George)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 **ERROR**Disregard this entry correctly re-filed as #8 . ANSWER to Complaint (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC.(Gunn, George) Modified on 12/21/2023 (ND).
December 21, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) found under Other Answers category. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). (CO)
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Expiration of the Statute of Limitations filed by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Manhattan Records, #2 Exhibit B - Power of Attorney)(Gunn, George)
December 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Expiration of the Statute of Limitations by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Gunn, George)
December 20, 2023 Filing 4 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC.(Gunn, George) Modified on 12/21/2023 (CO).
December 13, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Frye, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Volumes 1 (Frye, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC from The Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:23-cv-454-WLK. ( Filing fee paid; $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5290026 ) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaints served to Manhattan, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 State Court First Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Dorsey
Represented By: Walter Andrew Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?