The Mississippi Bar v. Starling
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Respondent: Brian Lee Starling
Interested Party: Arthur Johnston, Porfi Stokes, Patricia Green and Whitney Dilmore
Case Number: 3:2024ad00002
Filed: July 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISBARMENT as to Brian Lee Starling. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/30/2024. (WD)
August 12, 2024 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #2 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Brian Lee Starling, P.O. Box 775, Tupelo, MS 38802 returned marked Return to Sender/Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward. (WD)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Brian Lee Starling. Show Cause Response due by 08/29/2024. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 07/30/2024. (WD)
July 30, 2024 Filing 1 DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to Brian Lee Starling by the Supreme Court of Mississippi, dated 07/22/2024, Cause No. 2024-B-00205, and filed by same on 07/29/2024. (Attachments: #(1) Cover Letter, #(2) Envelope) (WD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mississippi Bar v. Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arthur Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Porfi Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Patricia Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Whitney Dilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?