Runnels v. Kadhim et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Runnels
Defendant: Zuhair Abdulrahman Kadhim, AN Enterprise, Inc. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2024cv00142
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 11/21/2024; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2024; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2024; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/23/2024; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/23/2024; Motions due by 12/5/2024; Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 4/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/29/24 (NL)
April 26, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/26/2024. Participants: John A. Waits and Roy Smith. Court conferred with counsel. Order to be entered. (NL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Ruby Runnels (Waits, John)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by AN Enterprise, Inc., Zuhair Abdulrahman Kadhim (Smith, Roy)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AN Enterprise, Inc. and Zuhair Abdulrahman Kadhim from The Circuit Court of Warren County, MS, case number 75CI1:23-CV-153. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid; receipt number AMSSDC-5358054 ) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnels v. Kadhim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Runnels
Represented By: John A. Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuhair Abdulrahman Kadhim
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AN Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?