Refre v. City of Philadelphia, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Daniel Refre
Defendant: City of Philadelphia, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2024cv00261
Filed: May 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Harris
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Defendants Pre-Discovery Disclosure by City of Philadelphia, Mississippi (Briggs, Robert)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Philadelphia, Mississippi (Briggs, Robert)
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant City of Philadelphia, Mississippi Volumes 1 (Briggs, Robert)
May 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Philadelphia, Mississippi from Neshoba County Circuit Court, case number 24-cv-084-NS-CM. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5403820) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Attachment - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Refre v. City of Philadelphia, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Refre
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Philadelphia, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert E. Briggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?