Saulny v. VGW Holdings Limited et al
Plaintiff: Makayla Darrielle Saulny
Defendant: VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited and VGW Holdings Limited
Case Number: 3:2024cv00619
Filed: October 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' reply briefs are now due 12/20/2024. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 12/4/2024. (RWS)
December 3, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in The Alternative, to Transfer, in Part, and Otherwise Dismiss The Complaint, #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Thompson, J.)
December 3, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. Additionally, scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (KNS)
December 3, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #15 : Attorney is to include complete style of case in future filings, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI, NORTHERN DIVISION. (KNS)
December 2, 2024 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Related to Response to Motion to Compel filed by Makayla Darrielle Saulny (Wells, Dennis)
December 2, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Makayla Darrielle Saulny (Wells, Dennis)
December 2, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in The Alternative, to Transfer, in Part, and Otherwise Dismiss The Complaint Related to Response To Motion filed by Makayla Darrielle Saulny (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wells, Dennis)
December 2, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in The Alternative, to Transfer, in Part, and Otherwise Dismiss The Complaint filed by Makayla Darrielle Saulny (Wells, Dennis)
December 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wells on behalf of Makayla Darrielle Saulny (Wells, Dennis)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney, Behnam Dayanim, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants, VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited, in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/21/24 (NL)
November 20, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Behnam Dayanim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5552177) by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, J.)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and Telephonic Case Management Conference. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for January 7, 2025, is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/19/2024 (NL)
November 19, 2024 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. 1-7-25 Telephonic Case Management Conference. (NL)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney,Gregory D. Beaman, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants, VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited, in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/19/24 (NL)
November 18, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in The Alternative, to Transfer, in Part, and Otherwise Dismiss The Complaint filed by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Antoine Cremona)(Thompson, J.)
November 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in The Alternative, to Transfer, in Part, and Otherwise Dismiss The Complaint by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Thompson, J.)
November 18, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Caterina Cavallaro)(Thompson, J.)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Thompson, J.)
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Gregory D. Beaman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5549909) by VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Malta Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW GP Limited (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, J.)
October 25, 2024 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on November 18, 2024, but if Plaintiff files a motion to remand on or before November 18, 2024, Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 30 days after this Court rules on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/18/24 (NL)
October 11, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from W. Dilmore, Attorney Admissions Clerk, to Dennis Wells regarding admission to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi.(TH) Modified on 10/11/2024 to correct docket text (ND).
October 10, 2024 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by VGW GP Limited, VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW Malta Limited (Thompson, J.)
October 10, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VGW GP Limited, VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW Malta Limited (Thompson, J.)
October 9, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VGW GP Limited, VGW Holdings Limited, VGW Luckyland Inc., VGW Malta Limited from In The Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:24-cv-00578-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5519097) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Michael Thunder, #2 Exhibit B--State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(TH) (Attachment 1 replaced with the correct PDF on 10/10/2024) (TH). (Attachment 2 replaced with the correct PDF on 10/10/2024) (TH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saulny v. VGW Holdings Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Malta Limited
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman - PHV
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Luckyland Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman - PHV
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW GP Limited
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman - PHV
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Holdings Limited
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman - PHV
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makayla Darrielle Saulny
Represented By: Dennis F. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?