Griffin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Belinda Griffin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2024cv00817
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Referring Judge: Bradley W Rath
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security (Thorp-Federal Gov, Whitney)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 . The time in which Defendant may file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is enlarged to March 20, 2025. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 2/14/25 (HM)
January 29, 2025 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 10813 (cwl)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting deadline. February 18, 2025 is Plaintiff's deadline to either file a renewed AO239 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) or pay the $405.00 civil filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 1/27/25 (HM)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 12/30/24 (HM)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. More information is needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 12/30/24 (HM)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Livengood Thorp-Federal Gov on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Thorp-Federal Gov, Whitney)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Belinda Griffin. (ND)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Belinda Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Griffin
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Whitney Livengood Thorp-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?