Dixon v. H and R Block et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Dixon, Jr.
Defendant: H and R Block and Sabrina Durr
Case Number: 3:2025cv00122
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Harris
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Reopen Case, by Clifton Dixon, Jr. (CDS)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT - This cause is dismissed without prejudice and closed on the Court's docket. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/20/2025 (ND) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/20/2025) (ND).
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This case is dismissed for failure to state a claim. The dismissal will be without prejudice. A separate Final Judgment shall issue this day. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/20/2025 (ND)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff.) (ND)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Dixon to file a complete IFP application on or before February 26, 2025, as stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on February 19, 2025. (TA)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Clifton Dixon, Jr. (ND)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sabrina Durr and H and R Block, filed by Clifton Dixon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. H and R Block et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Dixon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H and R Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Durr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?