Cooper v. Exeter Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: Marquita Cooper
Defendant: Exeter Finance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2025cv00129
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Marquita Cooper. (Exhibits not attached) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TH)
April 10, 2025 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2025 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel filed by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2025 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss filed by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2025 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
March 28, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Meyer on behalf of Exeter Finance, LLC (Meyer, Christopher)
March 27, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel by Marquita Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TH)
March 27, 2025 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Exeter Finance, LLC, filed by Marquita Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-Denial Email dated 1.20.25 from Exeter Finance LLC, #2 Envelope)(TH)
March 27, 2025 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Marquita Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TH)
March 20, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Exeter Finance, LLC, in Irving, Texas served on 3/4/2025, answer due 3/25/2025. (Attachments: #1 Green Card signed and dated, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(TH)
March 20, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Exeter Finance, LLC in Madison, MS served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Green Card signed and dated, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope) (TH)
March 20, 2025 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exeter Finance, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enzo Parent, LLC for Exeter Finance, LLC. (Leeth, Alan)
March 20, 2025 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
March 20, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Exeter Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Exeter Finance, LLC., Irving, TX. (TH) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/21/2025) (TH).
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Exeter Finance, LLC., Madison, MS. (TH) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2025) (TH).
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exeter Finance, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 10995), filed by Marquita Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Demand for Validation and Proof of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Retail Installment Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certified Return Receipts, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope), #6 Notice of Assignment) (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Exeter Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?