Taylor v. Town of Dekalb, MS et al
Case Number: 4:2006cv00124
Filed: September 26, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern Office
Presiding Judge: Linda R. Anderson
Presiding Judge: Tom S. Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER dismissing this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 1/4/10.(RRL)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part, denying in part 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment, as set out herein. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 6/19/09 (LWE)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 43 47 Motions to Compel; denying Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Default Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion to Seal. Granting Defendants' 65 Motion to Compel Plaintiff's deposition. Pla intiff to submit to properly noticed deposition on or before 4/21/09. Discovery extended until 5/4/2009 and motion deadline extended until 5/12/09. No further extensions or continuance of trial shall be granted by the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/20/09. (ACF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Town of Dekalb, MS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?