Century Services LP v. Tug Kristin Lee Hannah
Plaintiff: Century Services LP
Defendant: Tug Kristin Lee Hannah
Case Number: 5:2009cv00117
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Violation of Maritime Regulations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/28/2010 (ECW)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The clerk of court is ORDERED to disburse the proceeds from the sale in the amount of $10,000 to Century Services, LP care of counsel Sheryl Bey at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC, 4268 I-55 North, Meadowbrook Office Park, Jackson, Mississippi 39211 upon receipt of Century Services Entity Identification Number (EIN). Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on August 12, 2010. (lda)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that pursuant to Local Admiralty Rule A.1(L) the sale of the Tug KRISTIN LEE HANNAH (Ex DAVID E) to Century Services, LP is automatically confirmed. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on July 21, 2010. (lda)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER finding as moot 38 Motion for expedited consideration of motion for modification of court order regarding interlocutory sale of vessel; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for modification of court order regarding interlocutory sale of vessel as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4-22-2010 (ECW)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Motion for postponement of sale. Interlocutory sale of vessel scheduled for 2/19/10 is postponed until further order of Court. Decree Ordering Sale of Vessel 34 and Writ of Venditioni Exponas 35 are vacated until further order of Court. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2-17-10 (ECW)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECREE ORDERING SALE OF VESSEL (VACATED) granting 30 motion for interlocutory sale of vessel pursuant to Rule E(9) Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1-27-10 (ECW) Modified on 2/18/2010 (PKM).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/11/10 (PKM)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the actual notice of the pending suit be given the requisite individuals by mailing a notice of commencement of suit against the vessel to the requisite individuals by certified mail, postage prepaid, return receipt requested. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/14/09 (PKM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Services LP v. Tug Kristin Lee Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Services LP
Represented By: Sheryl M. Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tug Kristin Lee Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?