Chestang v. Alcorn State University et al
Plaintiff: Rudy Chestang, III
Defendant: Alcorn State University, Alcorn State University Board of Trustees and Alvin Simpson
Case Number: 5:2010cv00067
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss; denying 74 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/12/2011 (PL)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 78 Motion to Alter Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/17/2011 (PL)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/11/2011 (nr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestang v. Alcorn State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Chestang, III
Represented By: Brian Thaddeus Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn State University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Simpson
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?