Maxwell v. Hininger et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd George Maxwell
Defendant: Damon Hininger, Vance Laughlin, Unknown Slavens, Unknown Calhoun, Ryan Callahan, Unknown Molina and Unknown McDanial
Case Number: 5:2010cv00130
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Yazoo
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Defendants' 67 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendants Ryan Callahan, Michele Molina, Damon Hininger, and Vance Laughlin without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on March 21, 2013 (dsl)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying Supplemental Motion to Appoint Counsel 50 . Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 29, 2013 (dsl)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 53 . Defendants' Motion 51 to Dismiss is denied. Plaintiff shall properly serve prepared Summons, Complaint and Proofs of Services on all defendants within 45 days, or no later than August 24, 2012. Plaintiff is responsible for locating the appropriate addresses for all of the defendants, marking all mail "restricted delivery" that is going to an out-of-state defendant, and properly serving the defendants that are in-state residents pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Failure to properly serve the defendants will lead to dismissal of this case without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on July 25, 2012. (lda)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 40 is denied and the Clerk of Court is directed to issue proper summons to Plaintiff for Defendants Hininger, Laughlin, Slavens, Calhoun, Callahan, Molina and McDaniel. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2/9/2012 (dtj)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Produce; granting 18 Motion for additional time to pay to the extent the Court considers Plaintiff's payment of the $350.00 filing fee on January 3, 2011, to be in compliance with the previous orders of the Co urt. The Clerk is directed to re-open this civil action and assign Chief Magistrate Judge John M. Roper to the case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the requisite number of summons forms for his completion. When the summons are received in t he proper form, the Clerk is directed to issue the summons and return them to the Plaintiff for service on the Defendants. The Plaintiff is responsible for serving the Defendants in compliance with Rule 4, within 120 days from the date of this order . When the Defendants are properly served, each Defendant is required to respond to the Complaint. Plaintiff is warned that his failure to keep this Court informed of his current address or his failure to timely comply with any Order of this Court will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on March 18, 2011. (lda)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Set Aside the district court and/or appeal filing fees; denying 22 Motion to Set Aside the Order 13 entered on October 29, 2010. Plaintiff is warned that his continued requests, in whatever form, to circumvent the th ree-strikes bar applicable in this case will not be well-taken and may subject Plaintiff to sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions. The Court will await the conclusion of Plaintiff's pending appeals in this case before any further action will be taken by the Court, including a decision on Plaintiff's letter Motion 18 for an extension of time. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on January 21, 2011. (lda)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as Moot 7 Motion and Request for extension of time to pay the filing fee or in the alternative to make installment payments. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/28/2010 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Hininger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd George Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Hininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Slavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McDanial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?