United States of America v. $70,000 Seized from Mutual Credit Union, Account No. XXXXXX-04
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $70,000 Seized from Mutual Credit Union, Account No. XXXXXX-04
Claimant: Lee Davis
Case Number: 5:2011cv00105
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AGREED SETTLEMENT ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 24, 2012. (lda)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Strike. Claimant Lee Davis's answers or objections to interrogatories due June 6, 2012. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/11/2012 (ECW)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Vacate Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/28/2011 (dtj)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Default Judgment. The United States of America is hereby given a default judgment of forfeiture against $70,000 SEIZED FROM MUTUAL CREDIT UNION, ACCOUNT NO. XXXXXX-04 and against the interest therein of Lee A. Davi s and any and all persons or entities having or claiming an interest in defendant property; title to defendant property is hereby vested in the United States of America and any administrative claims or interests therein of any persons or entities, in cluding Lee A. Davis are hereby canceled; Defendant property is referred to the custody of the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) for disposition in accordance with law and regulations. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 17, 2011. (lda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $70,000 Seized from Mutual Credit Union, Account No. XXXXXX-04
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jason Scott Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $70,000 Seized from Mutual Credit Union, Account No. XXXXXX-04
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?