United States of America v. Stanley
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Markus Brent Stanley
Case Number: 5:2011cv00117
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 98 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The United States is afforded 10 days to furnish the Court with relevant information regarding supersedeas bond. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/5/2013 (ECW)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 11, 2013. (lda)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Bench Opinion (Memorandum Opinion and Order) Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/23/2013 (ECW)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ADVISING PARTIES THAT THE COURT WILL RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THIS CASE UNLESS DIRECTED OTHERWISE BY THE FIFTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 7/16/2013 (ECW)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 67 Motion ; denying 79 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 81 Motion to Stay Proceedings; denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 7/10/2013 (PL)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 63 Jury Demand filed by Markus Brent Stanley. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/18/2013 (PL)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4/24/2013 (PL)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/30/2012 (PL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Morgan Dowdy, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markus Brent Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?