Shorty v. Sparkman et al
Plaintiff: Eddie James Shorty
Defendant: Emmitt L. Sparkman, Larry Lee and Ray Byrd
Case Number: 5:2012cv00114
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 77 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 30, 2014. (js)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 43 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations 48 . Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/4/2013 (ECW)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 4 Motion for TRO; adopting Report and Recommendations 10 ; denying 15 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 17 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations 20 . Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/28/2013 (ECW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shorty v. Sparkman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmitt L. Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie James Shorty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?