House v. Buckhalter et al

Plaintiff: Scotty S. House
Defendant: Sue Buckhalter, Benj Yarbrough, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 5:2013cv00195
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 46 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 3/16/2016 (ECW)
December 28, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff, Scotty S. House, shall have ten (10) days from the date of entry of this Order to file a response to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 42 . If no response is filed, the Court will assume that the plaintiff has no objection to the motion. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 12/28/2015 (dtj)
June 3, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 38 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on June 2, 2015. (AA)
December 4, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 28 Report and Recommendations and remanding. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on December 4, 2014. (AA)
March 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's letter (motion) 20 to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 17, 2014 (KPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House v. Buckhalter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty S. House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Buckhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benj Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?