Elsas v. Preston et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Elsas
Defendant: Brent Preston, Justin Russell, Caleb Ensor, Yakkassippi, LLC and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 5:2015cv00028
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff to submit proposed Final Judgment as set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/4/2017 (ECW)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Attorney Fees; plaintiff to re-file motion as set forth in the Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/4/2017 (ECW)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 76 Motion in Limine Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/16/2016 (ECW)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 6 Motion for jury trial to the extent that any legal issues are pending. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 3/1/2016 (ECW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elsas v. Preston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Elsas
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Preston
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Russell
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Ensor
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakkassippi, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?