Alford v. Pike County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Bernard Alford
Defendant: Pike County Detention Center and Pike County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2015cv00077
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER ADOPTING 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion for Relief 143 and Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections 145 are collectively treated by the Court as the plaintiff's Objecti ons to Magistrate Judge Parker's Report and Recommendation; FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent the plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections 145 seeks additional time to file a third set of objections, said motion is DENIED; FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker's Report and Recommendation 142 is ADOPTED in its entirety as the findings and conclusions of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Complaint under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 3/2/2018 (ND)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying 109 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 7/14/2017 (ECW)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying as moot 89 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 92 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 97 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/1/2017 (ECW)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 84 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4/7/2017 (ECW)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 1/27/2017 (ECW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Recusal and denying 78 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 19, 2017. (js)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 66 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing plaintiff's claims that defendants failed to adequately respond to his grievances. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/30/2016 (ECW)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 54 Report and Recommendations; granting 57 Motion for Court to accept objections out of time. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/3/2016 (ECW)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING PIKE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER and PIKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. Pike County Detention Center and Pike County Sheriff's Department terminated. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on February 12, 2016 (lda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. Pike County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Bernard Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?