Horton v. Austrilis Oil and Gas
Plaintiff: Traesey L. Horton
Defendant: Austrilis Oil and Gas
Case Number: 5:2018cv00014
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Amite
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at #http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. (KNS)
August 28, 2018 Appeal Remark re #46 Notice of Appeal : Electronic appeal record has been certified for appeal purposes and waiting for acceptance from the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. Once the record has been accepted, a separate docket entry will be made notifying parties that they may then access the record via the Fifth Circuit website. (KNS)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #41 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #42 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 08/24/18 (KNS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 49 ATTACHMENT /Addendum re #41 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment, #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 25, 2018 Filing 48 Appeal Remark re #46 Notice of Appeal : copy of CORRECTED USCA Initial Case Check letter to appellant, Ms. Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 copy of USCA Initial Case Check Letter to appellee's counsel)(KNS)
July 23, 2018 Filing 47 USCA Case Number 18-60508 for #46 Notice of Appeal filed by Traesey L. Horton. (MGB)
July 13, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #39 Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 2, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment, filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 27, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #43 Response to Motion, re #41 MOTION for Reconsideration and #42 Amended Motion for Reconsideration filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
June 27, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment, #42 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
June 22, 2018 Filing 42 AMENDED MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 19, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 18, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Cross-Claim Amendment by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
June 15, 2018 Filing 39 FINAL JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is hereby finally dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 06/15/18 (KNS)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #36 Motion for Default Judgment; denying #15 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #19 Motion ; denying #25 Motion for Default Judgment; and granting #12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 06/15/18 (KNS)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING CASE. This matter is stayed pending the ruling on the current motions or until otherwise ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 6, 2018. (jg)
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/5/2018. The court addressed procedural and case management issues and the possibility of a stay. An order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Traesey Horton, pro se plaintiff; Eric Patterson and Bill Blair for defendant. (KPM)
June 1, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION / REQEUST for Default Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 1, 2018 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #29 MOTION for Default Judgment as to MOTION to Strike #26 Response to Motion filed by Traesey L. Horton. (KNS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2018: #1 Envelope) (KNS).
May 30, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Blair on behalf of Austrilis Oil and Gas (Blair, William)
May 30, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #32 Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric) Modified on 5/30/2018 (KNS).
May 30, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Default Judgment as to MOTION to Strike #26 Response to Motion filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
May 25, 2018 Filing 31 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM AND POINTS OF AUTHORITY in Support re #29 MOTION to Strike, and MOTION to enter Default Judgment re #26 Response to Motion filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
May 23, 2018 Set Status Conference: Status Conference set for 6/5/2018 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. (jg)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for a Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 23, 2018. (jg)
May 22, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #26 Response to Motion; and MOTION to enter Default Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS) Modified on 5/22/2018 (KNS).
May 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Status Conference by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
May 18, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
May 18, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #19 MOTION Crossclaim Motion of Notice of Response to Defendant's Summary Judgment, and Motion for Default Judgment filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
May 17, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
May 14, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss filed by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl)
April 30, 2018 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT re #19 MOTION Crossclaim by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 24, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Response to Motion,, for Summary Judgment filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
April 24, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Conveyance, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #6 Exhibit SC Notice, #7 Exhibit Opinion and Order, #8 Exhibit Final Judgment, #9 Exhibit Assignment, Bill of Sale and Conveyance, #10 Exhibit Email, #11 Exhibit Order, #12 Exhibit Email, #13 Exhibit Affirmative Defenses, #14 Exhibit Letter to Board, #15 Exhibit Plat, #16 Exhibit Affidavit)(Patterson, Eric)
April 23, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION Crossclaim filed by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - list of 24 wells, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's title opinion, #5 Exhibit E - copy of MS Code 53-3-7, #6 Envelope)(KNS)
April 23, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for crossclaim by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 16, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
April 16, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 16, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Traesey L. Horton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 9, 2018 Filing 14 Plaintiff's RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 5, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss filed by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Patterson, Eric)
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss by Austrilis Oil and Gas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed, #5 Exhibit Appeal, #6 Exhibit SC Dismissal, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Final Judgment, #9 Exhibit Assignment, #10 Exhibit Emails, #11 Exhibit Special Field Rules, #12 Exhibit Emails, #13 Exhibit OGB Petition, #14 Exhibit Response, #15 Exhibit Plats, #16 Exhibit Affidavit)(Patterson, Eric)
March 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Austrilis Oil and Gas served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (KNS)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Response to Order re #6 ORDER directing response re process issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 28, 2018. (jg) filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
March 15, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Austrilis Oil and Gas. (Certified copy of #8 Order and Summons placed in U.S. Marshal's box.) (KNS)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing issuance and service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/15/18 (KNS)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Response to Order re #6 ORDER directing response re process issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 28, 2018. (jg) filed by Traesey L. Horton. (KNS)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing response re process issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 28, 2018. (jg)
February 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF AMENDED RESPONSE by Traesey L. Horton re Amendment to #4 Response to Order #3 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No process will issue at this time. On or before February 28, 2018, Plaintiff shall provide the court with the name and address of an appropriate agent or officer to accept process on behalf ofAustrilis Oil And Gas.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 14, 2018. (jg) filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope from Hattiesburg)(KNS)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No process will issue at this time. On or before February 28, 2018, Plaintiff shall provide the court with the name and address of an appropriate agent or officer to accept process on behalf ofAustrilis Oil And Gas.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 14, 2018. (jg)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Austrilis Oil and Gas, filed by Traesey L. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Affidavit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Envelope)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Austrilis Oil and Gas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traesey L. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austrilis Oil and Gas
Represented By: Eric L. Patterson
Represented By: William F. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?