Wilson v. Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrance Wilson
Defendant: Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00144
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica T. Pulliam on behalf of Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. (Pulliam, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. (Marsh, Jason)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. answer due 3/8/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 6, 2019 (KPM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrance Wilson. Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Espy, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. (VM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3884457), filed by Terrance Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claiborne County Nursing Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica T. Pulliam
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Wilson
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?