McGee v. Wilkinson County School District et al

Plaintiff: Alton McGee
Defendant: Wilkinson County School District and Kimberly Jackson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00016
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 6/7/19. (KPM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District.(Brown, Kristi)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District, filed by Alton McGee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-EEOC Chg #423-2018-01801, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-RTS-#423-20108-01801, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-EEOC Chg #423-2019-00366, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-RTS-#423-2019-00366)(Watson, Louis)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and without objection, the Motion #6 is granted. Kimberly Jackson answer due 5/3/2019; Wilkinson County School District answer due 5/3/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 22, 2019. (MMc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District (Brown, Kristi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Rogers Brown on behalf of Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District (Brown, Kristi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alton McGee. Kimberly Jackson waiver sent on 2/18/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Watson, Louis)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alton McGee. Wilkinson County School District waiver sent on 2/18/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Watson, Louis)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District. (MGB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Jackson, Wilkinson County School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3918572), filed by Alton McGee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Wilkinson County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton McGee
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkinson County School District
Represented By: Kristi Rogers Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Jackson
Represented By: Kristi Rogers Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?