AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. v. Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC

Plaintiff: AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00027
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, as follows: That this Final Judgment shall be and hereby is a judgment by default against Defendant Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez pursuant to Rule 55(b), Fed. R. Civ. P.; That the Plaintiff, GM Financial, recovers of and from the Defendant Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez the principal sum of $125,612.72, plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 8.0% per annum, until paid in full; and That the Plaintiff, GM Financial, recovers of and from the Defendant Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez, the amount of $7,789.24 evidencing the sum of attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 7/3/2019 (VM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez filed by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Leeth, Alan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dan Arndt, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Alan Leeth)(Leeth, Alan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendant Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC (ASJ)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC d/b/a Toyota of Natchez by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit)(Leeth, Alan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Leeth, Alan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Meyer on behalf of AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Meyer, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Company for AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Leeth, Alan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC. (VM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3962572), filed by AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc. v. Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Company of Mississippi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AmericCredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?