Smith v. Adams County Sheriff Department et al

Plaintiff: Dustin A. Smith
Defendant: Travis Patten, Wayne Rabb and Adams County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00048
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Travis Patten (Allen, R.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Travis Patten (Allen, R.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Travis Patten (Allen, R.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 8/16/19. (KPM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Adams County Sheriff Department, Travis Patten, Wayne Rabb.(Allen, R.)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Ore Tenus Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers due 7/15/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 5, 2019 (KPM)
July 5, 2019 Unopposed Ore Tenus MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (KPM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin A. Smith. Travis Patten served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Bowden, Benjamin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin A. Smith. Adams County Sheriff Department served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Bowden, Benjamin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of All Defendants (Allen, R.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin A. Smith. Wayne Rabb served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Bowden, Benjamin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adams County Sheriff Department, Travis Patten and Wayne Rabb. (ND)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams County Sheriff Department, Travis Patten and Wayne Rabb ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 34643055065), filed by Dustin A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Adams County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Patten
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Rabb
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff Department
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin A. Smith
Represented By: Benjamin U. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?