DEARING v. W.C.C.F.
Plaintiff: Dewayne Dearing
Defendant: W.C.C.F., Trinity Food Service, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI and Mississippi Department of Corrections
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00049
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT. IT IS, HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this civil action filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 4/17/2019 (VM)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing this Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pro se Plaintiff Dewayne Dearing's Motion #2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this cause is denied pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). And because Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. A separate Final Judgment will be entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of Court is directed to re-open this civil action if the full filing fee of $350.00 plus an administrative fee of $50.00 is paid within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 7/17/2019 (VM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment. (Copy mailed to plaintiff). (VM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Mississippi. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 04/29/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEWAYNE DEARING (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, TRINITY FOOD SERVICE, W.C.C.F. filed by DEWAYNE DEARING. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/09/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEARING v. W.C.C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.C.C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Food Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?