Watson v. Claiborne County School District et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Watson
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-24 and Claiborne County School District
Case Number: 5:2019cv00069
Filed: August 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Claiborne County School District (ASJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Watson. (Eichelberger, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
September 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed. The issued first page should be included, preceding the Proof of Service. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default by Brenda Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Eichelberger, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Watson. Claiborne County School District served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Eichelberger, Jonathan) Modified on 9/10/2019 (VM).
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Brenda Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Eichelberger, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Claiborne County School District on 8/15/2019, filed by Brenda Watson. (Eichelberger, Jonathan) Modified on 9/10/2019 (VM).
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Claiborne County School District. (VM)
August 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Claiborne County School District, John and Jane Does 1-24 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4051507), filed by Brenda Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter from CPNP Harris, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter from Dr. Parker, #3 Exhibit 3 Findings of the Mississippi Department of Education's Office of Spe, #4 Exhibit 4 Certificate from Claiborne County Family Health Center, #5 Exhibit 5 Letter from Nurse Wright, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter from Dr. Wright, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Claiborne County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Watson
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Eichelberger
Represented By: Jennie A. Eichelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claiborne County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?