Brewer v. City of McComb City, Mississippi
Plaintiff: David L. Brewer
Defendant: City of McComb City, Mississippi
Case Number: 5:2019cv00076
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by City of McComb City, Mississippi.(Clark, Howard)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of McComb City, Mississippi answer due 10/18/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 12, 2019. (MMc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Siler, Jr on behalf of City of McComb City, Mississippi (Siler, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by City of McComb City, Mississippi (Clark, Howard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David L. Brewer. City of McComb City, Mississippi served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Horn, Dennis)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of McComb City, Mississippi, filed by David L. Brewer.(Horn, Dennis)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of McComb City, Mississippi. (cwl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of McComb City, Mississippi ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4065998), filed by David L. Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. City of McComb City, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Brewer
Represented By: Dennis L. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of McComb City, Mississippi
Represented By: William T. Siler, Jr.
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?