Raymond James Trust, N.A. v. Natchez Hospital Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymond James Trust, N.A.
Defendant: R.N. Patricia Cavin, R.N. Bonnie Vines, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, M.D. Danita Weary, M.D. Jennifer Russ, M.D. Melissa Jones, John and Jane Does A, B, C, D, and E and R.N. Laura Usnik
Case Number: 5:2019cv00103
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and Answer by Melissa Jones (Fair, Bailey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Patricia Cavin, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, Laura Usnik.(Caraway, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss by Melissa Jones.(Morris, Mildred)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer by Melissa Jones (Morris, Mildred)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Todd A. Townsley is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 5, 2019 (KPM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Todd A. Townsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4131070) by Raymond James Trust, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Devereaux, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by R. E. Parker, Jr on behalf of Jennifer Russ, Danita Weary (Parker, R.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David and Lacie Cupit by Jennifer Russ, Danita Weary (Lawson, Penny)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Danita Weary (Lawson, Penny)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Jennifer Russ (Lawson, Penny)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Jennifer Russ (Lawson, Penny)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of First Request for Admissions by Jennifer Russ (Lawson, Penny)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Legal Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jennifer Russ, Danita Weary.(Lawson, Penny)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David H. Hanchey is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 23, 2019 (KPM)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The certificate of good standing is not current. See L.U.Civ. R. 83.1(d)(4). The motion is denied without prejudice to movant's right to file a corrected motion in conformance with the local rules. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 23, 2019 (KPM)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for David H. Hanchey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4120172) by Raymond James Trust, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Devereaux, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Todd A. Townsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4120165) by Raymond James Trust, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Devereaux, Matthew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Patricia Cavin, Melissa Jones, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, Jennifer Russ, Laura Usnik, Bonnie Vines, Danita Weary. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jones, #2 Summons Natchez, #3 Summons Russ, #4 Summons Usnik, #5 Summons Vines, #6 Summons Weary)(cwl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Cavin, John and Jane Does A, B, C, D, and E, Melissa Jones, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, Jennifer Russ, Laura Usnik, Bonnie Vines, Danita Weary ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384114416), filed by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond James Trust, N.A. v. Natchez Hospital Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Patricia Cavin
Represented By: Mark P. Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Bonnie Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natchez Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark P. Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Danita Weary
Represented By: R. E. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Penny Beckwith Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Jennifer Russ
Represented By: R. E. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Penny Beckwith Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Melissa Jones
Represented By: Mildred M. Morris
Represented By: Bailey R. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A, B, C, D, and E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Laura Usnik
Represented By: Mark P. Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond James Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew L. Devereaux
Represented By: Todd A. Townsley - PHV
Represented By: David H. Hanchey - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?