Kirkwood v. Perkins et al
Plaintiff: Thurman Kirkwood
Defendant: Dr. Walker, Sgt Brown, Major Perkins, Sgt Karen Brown, Mr. Gabriel Walker, Scott Middlebrooks and Major Erica Perkins
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00104
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walker, Scott Middlebrooks, Brown, Perkins. Walker waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Scott Middlebrooks waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Brown waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Perkins waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Griffin, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven James Griffin on behalf of Brown, Scott Middlebrooks, Perkins, Walker (Griffin, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Remark: Defendants' names updated/changed per #20 Waiver. (KNS)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker for all further proceedings provided for by 28 U.S.C. 636 and Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 10/31/19 (KNS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Warden Scott Middlebrooks, Major Perkins, Mrs. Brown, Unit Manager, Mr. Walker, Warden on 10/23/2019. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2019. (CS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/23/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Clerk shall add Scott Middlebrooks, Warden, as a Defendant and edit Defendant Dr. Walker to Mr. Walker, Warden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment of Case Number. (KNS) (Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Transferring Action to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/16/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Case Transferred to District of Southern Mississippi. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #9 Order. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Spears Hearing set for 12/17/2019 10:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/25/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/18/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE OF INTENT TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/4/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thurman Kirkwood. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Thurman Kirkwood. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Kirkwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Karen Brown
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Gabriel Walker
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Middlebrooks
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Erica Perkins
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?