Watts v. Penalleton
Plaintiff: Carl Watts
Defendant: Hearing Officer S. Penalleton
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00122
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT - IT IS, HEREBY, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this cause is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 12/18/2019 (ND)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE and DENYING IFP - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's Motions #2 , #7 for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. A separate final judgment shall issue pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of Court is directed to re-open this civil action if the full filing fee of $350.00 plus an administrative fee of $50.00 is paid within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 12/18/2019 (ND)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in response to #4 ORDER by Carl Watts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Carl Watts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE filed by Carl Watts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/18/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/18/2019. (CS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carl Watts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S. Penalleton, filed by Carl Watts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rule Violation Report, #2 Exhibit B - Rules, #3 Exhibit C - ARP Rejection, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Penalleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearing Officer S. Penalleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?