Singh v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Inderjit Singh
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr, U.S. ICE Field Officer Director, Warden Shawn R. Gillis and Secretary of DHS
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00126
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number 34643057307), filed by Inderjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM) filed by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Deportation Officer Robert Hallanger, #2 Exhibit B, Docket Sheet, 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #3 Exhibit C, Filing Reciept for BIA Motion, #4 Exhibit D, Decision to Continue Custody, #5 Exhibit E, Travel Document)(Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn R. Gillis answer due 1/13/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 7, 2020. (MMc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn R. Gillis answer due 1/5/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 17, 2019 (KPM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Civil Process Clerk) served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (PKM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Attorney General of the United States) served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (PKM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (cwl)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, defendants U.S. ICE Field Officer Director, W. B. Barr and Secretary of DHS are terminated. Respondent Warden Shawn R. Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/21/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number 34643057307), filed by Inderjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ICE Field Officer Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inderjit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?