Abiodun v. Gillis et al
Plaintiff: Idris Abiodun
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello, John Doe, Kevin K. McAleen, Warden Shawn R. Gillis, Jered Miller and William Barr
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00133
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #5 Order to Show Cause Mail sent to Idris Abiodun (cwl)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Petitioner on or before February 5, 2020, directed to respond to this Order to Show Cause in writing and explain why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's Order #3 . Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/13/2020. [Copy of Order and Order #3 mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Return to Sender as to #3 Order. Mail sent to Idris Abiodun. (PG)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before January 3, 2020, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 12/13/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mail sent to Idris Abiodun. (PG)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643057449.), filed by Idris Abiodun. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abiodun v. Gillis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jered Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idris Abiodun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?