Vargas v. Gillis
Petitioner: Evaristo Serrano Vargas
Respondent: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00051
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058562.), filed by Evaristo Serrano Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT) filed by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Officer Shane Musgrave,, #2 Exhibit B-Judgment D. South Dakota., #3 Exhibit C-Judgment N.D. Iowa, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Denying Motion to Enforce Order., #5 Exhibit E-Motion for Bond Hearing)(Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis c/o (Attorney General) served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (LAT)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden Shawn R. Gillis served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (LAT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis c/o Civil Process Clerk served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (cwl)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Respondent Warden Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/10/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058562.), filed by Evaristo Serrano Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evaristo Serrano Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?