SINGH v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: Yadwinder Singh
Defendant: Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf, Attorney General William P. Barr, Stanley Crockett, Ken Cuccinelli and Warden Shawn Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00052
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before May 7, 2020, Petitioner shall either sign the Petition or file a written response showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to obey Order #7 . Show Cause Response due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 04/23/2020. [Copy of Order and a copy of the signature page of the Petition mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Response to #7 ORDER in re #1 Petition, filed by Yadwinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov on behalf of All Defendants (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel by Matthew Albence, William P. Barr, Stanley Crockett, Ken Cuccinelli, Shawn Gillis, Chad Wolf (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Petitioner shall sign the Petition under oath and file it with the Court no later than April 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/25/2020. [Copy of Order and a copy of the signature page of the Petition mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment case number. (KNS) (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/28/2020) (KNS).
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00565. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE FORTHWITH to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, Western Division. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 28, 2020. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2020. The Court Will Issue An Order Transferring The Case. (Court Reporter BRYAN WAYNE.) (mac) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 Emergency Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference on the Petition and Motion is set for February 28, 2020 at 3:00 PM. At the conference, the Court intends to address (1) whether the Court should transfer the case to another judicial district, see Nken v. Napolitano, 607 F. Supp. 2d 149 (D.D.C. 2009); and (2) whether the Court must dismiss the case in its entirety for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 8 U.S.C. 1252(a)(2)(A), (a)(5). Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 28, 2020. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, STANLEY CROCKETT, KEN CUCCINELLI, SHAWN GILLIS, CHAD WOLF (eg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Emergancy MOTION to Stay Removal by YADWINDER SINGH (eg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, STANLEY CROCKETT, KEN CUCCINELLI, SHAWN GILLIS, CHAD WOLF ( Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 4616102524) filed by YADWINDER SINGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 2/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SINGH v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Crockett
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadwinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?