Nikhil v. Julian
Petitioner: Nikhil Nikhil
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Customs and Border Protection, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Justice, Stephen Julian, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf, Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Jedidah Hussey
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Stephen Julian answer due 5/18/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 7, 2020. (MMc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #2 MOTION for an Administrative stay of Removal and Directing Service by Stephen Julian (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Stephen Julian (Attorney General) served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (LAT)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Stephen Julian (Civil Process Clerk) served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (LAT)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Stephen Julian (Warden) served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (LAT)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, proper Respondent is Stephen Julian, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center and the additional Respondents listed on the docket are hereby removed as a Respondent. Clerk correct the short title of this case to "Nikhil v. Julian." Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 04/14/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER, on or before April 2, 2020, Petitioner must submit for filing the signed "Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury" attached to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/11/2020. [Copy of Order, pages 1-18 of the Petition #1 and Declaration mailed to Petitioner] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury) (CS) filed by Nikhil Nikhil. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Order dated 3/11/2020, #2 Envelope)(LAT)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before April 2, 2020, Petitioner must submit for filing the signed "Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury" attached to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/11/2020. [Copy of Order, pages 1-18 of the Petition #1 and Declaration mailed to Petitioner] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury) (CS)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for an Administrative Stay of Removal and Directing Service by Nikhil Nikhil. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT). Added MOTION for Directing Service on 3/10/2020 (LAT).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058724.), filed by Nikhil Nikhil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- CFI, Credible Fear Interview, #2 Exhibit B- 1st RFR, Request for Reconsideration Letter, #3 Exhibit C- 1st RFR, Request for Reconsideration Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit D- 2nd RFR, Motion format without supporting documents Denial letter, #5 Exhibit E- 2nd RFR, Motion format without supporting documents Denial letter, #6 Exhibit F- 3rd RFR, Motion format with supporting documents, #7 Envelope, #8 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT) Modified on 3/10/2020 (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikhil v. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Julian
Represented By: Stephen R. Graben-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jedidah Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nikhil Nikhil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?